PRIME THEATRE

Charity number: 298436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Prime Theatre (formally known as Sixth Sense Theatre Company) entertains, educates and empowers young people (0-25yrs) through professional theatre and the creative activities associated with this. Our professional productions tour across the South West and to the rest of the UK and are complemented by an accredited programme of youth theatre, schools and community workshops and events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £417,307
Total expenditure: £334,043

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SIXTH SENSE THEATRE COMPANY (Previous name)
  • SIXTH SENSE THEATRE TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Nicholas Richard Capstick OBE Chair 06 July 2020
None on record
Alexandra Batty Trustee 04 February 2021
None on record
Jade Bennett Trustee 04 February 2021
None on record
Laura Katherine Goulden Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
Emma Carter Trustee 09 June 2016
None on record
Sharon Hodge Trustee 09 June 2016
None on record
PETER HORWAT Trustee 21 November 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £332.77k £279.08k £376.79k £421.69k £417.31k
Total expenditure £258.97k £220.97k £269.26k £327.47k £334.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £49.30k £19.30k £19.30k
Income from government grants £123.54k £128.56k £90.00k £195.06k £217.56k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WYVERN THEATRE
THEATRE SQUARE
SWINDON
SN1 1QN
Phone:
01793614846