EQUAL PEOPLE MENCAP

Charity number: 298609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £703.50k £885.69k £967.88k £1.18m £1.49m
Total expenditure £758.48k £875.94k £978.25k £1.19m £1.49m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £105.60k £93.47k £106.38k £98.20k £80.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £18.46k £26.53k £32.40k £20.70k £4.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £684.67k £858.96k £935.35k £1.15m £1.49m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £379 £194 £120 £170 £48
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £749.43k £875.94k £955.13k £1.16m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £23.12k £31.62k £45.82k
Expenditure - Governance £11.58k £12.57k £0 £0 £15.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £9.06k £0 £0 £0 £7.88k