BEAUMONT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 298630
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.35k £35.85k £35.88k £35.60k £43.95k
Total expenditure £30.42k £12.99k £40.53k £38.35k £49.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A