Financial history ST PHILOMENA'S SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 298635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £772.94k £680.77k £841.78k £857.48k £938.88k
Total expenditure £783.60k £743.73k £787.98k £732.45k £716.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £31.41k £2.90k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £53.42k £7.02k £41.65k £4.71k £2.09k
Income - Other trading activities £4.39k £2.63k £7.58k £20.62k £40.84k
Income - Charitable activities £710.20k £668.70k £792.37k £832.13k £895.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £95 £132 £185 £21 £122
Income - Other £4.83k £2.29k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £783.50k £743.58k £787.93k £732.45k £715.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds £102 £146 £56 £0 £755
Expenditure - Governance £6.69k £0 £0 £0 £3.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0