Financial history CHARITY OF ELSPETH MARY CARR FOR RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 298674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £0 £400 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £2.14k £890 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A