FOREST PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 298690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £34.18k £34.62k £38.36k £40.74k £33.57k
Total expenditure £22.15k £24.59k £25.76k £53.16k £22.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £23.06k