Financial history D M AND L H BAYLIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 298708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.50k £29.64k £44.00k £35.10k £19.43k
Total expenditure £18.13k £5.85k £44.26k £60.42k £19.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A