Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S TRUST

Charity number: 298806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required