Financial history SELF HELP AFRICA (UK)

Charity number: 298830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.78m £3.50m £2.24m £4.77m £1.28m
Total expenditure £3.49m £2.64m £2.75m £3.24m £2.43m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £217.26k N/A
Income from government grants £1.49m £400.94k £337.15k £217.26k £37.68k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.75m £784.93k £2.18m £1.31m £878.71k
Income - Other trading activities £30.19k £88.91k £62.58k £129.24k £10.69k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £2.63m £0 £3.34m £386.97k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £174 £473 £1.10k £271 £178
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.55k
Income - Legacies £0 £10.80k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.34m £2.45m £2.48m £2.98m £2.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £151.30k £191.27k £269.87k £266.59k £130.37k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.55k £14.46k £17.09k £18.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0