Financial history SOUTHBANK CENTRE

Charity number: 298909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £68.08m £52.01m £52.45m £60.42m £36.20m
Total expenditure £47.47m £54.09m £57.20m £55.04m £37.22m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.89m £25.40m £19.95m £20.90m £24.52m
Income - Donations and legacies £36.44m £30.33m £23.49m £23.21m £26.62m
Income - Other trading activities £13.84m £13.70m £15.63m £18.01m £8.50m
Income - Charitable activities £8.36m £7.97m £13.31m £11.42m £1.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £15.00k £16.00k £40.00k £27.00k
Income - Other £9.43m £0 £0 £7.74m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £38.28m £45.82m £47.91m £45.29m £29.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £859.00k £942.00k £1.22m £1.18m £1.05m
Expenditure - Governance £352.00k £74.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £8.33m £7.33m £8.07m £8.56m £6.38m