Trustees AHMADIYYA MUSLIM ASSOCIATION UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 299081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

39 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAFIQ AHMED HAYAT Chair
HUMANITY FIRST
Received: On time
MUHAMMAD AHSAN AHMAD Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
MOHAMMED RAFIUDDIN Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
NASIM JAMAL Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Dr ANAS AHMAD RANA Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
IMRAN NASIR ALI Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
IMRAN MEHMOOD SHEIKH Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Dr MOHAMMED IQBAL Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Dr MAQBOOL SANI SETHI Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
HAFIZ FAZAL RABBI Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
MIRZA KHALIQUE AHMAD Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
ATTA UL QUDDUS Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Syed Naseer Ahmad Trustee 06 April 2021
None on record
Jonathan Charles Butterworth Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Mohammad Ashraf Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Muhammad Ibrahim Ikhlaf Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Naseer Ahmad Dean Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Mohamed Ahsan Ahmedi Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Malik Mohyuddin Abdullah Trustee 30 June 2019
None on record
Nadimur Rahman Trustee 30 June 2019
None on record
ABDUL QUDDUS ARIF Trustee 01 November 2018
MAJLIS KHUDDAMUL AHMADIYYA (UK)
Received: On time
DR Ch Ijaz Ur Rehman Trustee 01 July 2016
HUMANITY FIRST UK
Received: On time
Mr Mujib Ahmad Mirza Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
FAHIM ANWER Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Irfan Ahmed Quraishi Trustee 26 November 2014
IAAAE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
Abdul Rasheed Mirza Trustee 01 July 2013
None on record
Nisar Ahmad Orchard Trustee 01 July 2013
None on record
Tariq Mahmood Sheikh Trustee 01 July 2013
None on record
Abdullah Jheengoor Trustee 01 July 2013
None on record
Irfan Chaudhry Trustee 01 July 2013
None on record
SULTAN LONE Trustee 29 March 2013
None on record
MASROOR AHMAD Trustee 25 April 2011
None on record
FAREED AHMAD Trustee
None on record
Dr TARIQ ANWAR BAJWA Trustee
None on record
Dr MUNAWAR AHMAD Trustee
None on record
AHMAD SALAM Trustee
MUHAMMAD HUSSAIN HAJIRA HUSSAIN ABDUS SALAM NOBEL TALENT FUND
Received: On time
Dr SHABIR AHMED BHATTI Trustee
None on record
MOHAMMED NASSER KHAN Trustee
None on record
MANSOOR AHMED SHAH Trustee
None on record