NATIONAL AMBULANCE HERITAGE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 31 May 1988: Standard registration
- 10 August 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NATIONAL AMBULANCE MUSEUM/PLYMOUTH AND DISTRICT AMBULANCE PRESERVATION SOCIETY (Previous name)
- PLYMOUTH AND DISTRICT AMBULANCE PRESERVATION SOCIETY (Previous name)
- THE AMBULANCE MUSEUM (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 24TH OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED 18TH MARCH 1988 AND 2ND JULY 1990
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF BRITISH AND FOREIGN AMBULANCE VEHICLES. (2) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF BRITISH AND FOREIGN AMBULANCE VEHICLES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (3) TO RELIEVE SICK AND NEEDY CHILDREN LIVING IN THE AREA BY THE PROVISION OF AN AMBULANCE. (4) TO PROVIDE A MUSEUM OF AMBULANCES AND ARTIFICES RELATED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
(1) NATIONAL (2) DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.