GAMLINGAY AND GRANSDEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 29 April 1988: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 September 2009: Standard registration
- 1ST GAMLINGAY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Gordon Collins | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Hearth | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lintott | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert O'Shea | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Jackson | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dana Humphries | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS ELWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REGINALD STEVEN PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.20k | £16.93k | £18.28k | £15.44k | £12.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.62k | £14.76k | £9.08k | £14.25k | £19.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER - 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Chapel Field
Gamlingay
SANDY
Bedfordshire
SG19 3QP
- Phone:
- 01767 677562
- Email:
- sue@sechase.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window