Financial history NEW LIFE CHURCH BEDFORDSHIRE TRUST

Charity number: 299289
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £98.16k £120.73k £118.07k £129.29k £92.24k
Total expenditure £102.29k £109.61k £113.20k £128.51k £99.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £47.41k £32.40k
Income from government grants £26.00k £35.00k £33.99k N/A N/A