FRIEND COUNSELLING (LONDON) LTD

Charity number: 299307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £215.26k £320.57k £373.14k £344.40k £529.43k
Total expenditure £256.50k £288.27k £380.75k £360.41k £450.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £41.36k £91.32k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £334.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £194.35k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £247
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £82.39k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £449.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.38k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0