DEVELOPMENT THROUGH CHALLENGE

Charity number: 299332
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 February 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 July 2016 On time Download