BRANKSOME ST ALDHELMS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 299361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.86k £17.18k £19.01k £18.05k £15.41k
Total expenditure £13.34k £13.30k £19.98k £16.63k £8.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A