ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY IN BRITAIN

Charity number: 299362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 February 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 February 2017 23 days late Download