Financial history SOUTHAMPTON MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 299426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £27.05k £28.70k £16.86k £12.89k £3.36k
Total expenditure £32.12k £25.04k £15.24k £5.30k £1.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A