FRIENDLY CLUB FOR THE BLIND, SUTTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friendly Club for the Blind provides Social activities for Blind and partially sighted people within the London Borough of Sutton and its immediate surroundings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 03 June 1988: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 September 2014: Re-registered
- FRIENDLY CLUB FOR THE BLIND SUTTON (Working name)
- SUTTON BLIND CLUB (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS K P CLARIDGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Graham Currie | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Hazel Garrett | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MIKOWSKI | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS P R DOERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE BOWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £5.02k | £1.07k | £120 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23k | £730 | £1.49k | £3.02k | £2.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CLUB SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS, OR HERAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Mill View Close
Ewell
EPSOM
KT17 2DW
- Phone:
- 02083937127
- Email:
- handkclaridge@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window