Financial history LADY ZIA WERNHER SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 299485
Charity reporting is overdue by 374 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £2 £2 £1 £8 £9
Total expenditure £974 £2.23k £215 £132 £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A