THE UNITED KINGDOM ENVIRONMENTAL LAW ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 299498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Lui Trustee 13 August 2019 None on record
Juliet Munn Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
Lucy Bruce Jones Trustee 28 June 2019 None on record
NICK WHITAKER Trustee 03 July 2015
MCS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
PEACE DIRECT Received: On time
Christian Jowett Trustee 07 July 2017 None on record
Nina Carty Pindam Trustee 22 June 2018 None on record
SIMON ANDREW TILLING Trustee 24 July 2013 None on record
James Alexander Cameron Whittle Trustee 24 July 2019 None on record
James David Mark Adler Trustee 25 June 2020 None on record
Benjamin Stansfield Trustee 13 August 2019 None on record
Ned Westaway Trustee 20 June 2014 None on record
KAREN LOUISE BLAIR Trustee 24 July 2013 None on record
KIRSTY SCHNEEBERGER MBE Chair 05 July 2011 None on record
Dr HAYDN DAVIES Trustee 18 March 2013 None on record
Estelle Dehon Trustee 28 June 2019 None on record
Alison Margaret York Trustee 22 June 2018 None on record
PENELOPE LATORRE Trustee 24 July 2013 None on record
Simone Davidson Trustee 22 June 2018 None on record
Warren Lee Percival Trustee 07 July 2017 None on record
Philip Hunter Trustee 25 April 2017 None on record
Dr Veneta Cooney Trustee 07 July 2017 None on record