Dogfen lywodraethu BUSINESS LAUNCHPAD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/03/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/07/1988
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION OF WELFARE OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AND PRIMARILY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH, AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION TRAINING AND RESOURCES FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OR UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.