Financial history WILTSHIRE & SWINDON PHAB MAGAZINE & AREA COMMITTEE

Charity number: 299607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.64k £1.67k £1.27k £1.59k £241
Total expenditure £1.78k £1.47k £1.48k £1.56k £775
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A