CASSL

Charity number: 299665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £101.23k £80.30k £50.23k £23.14k £12.39k
Total expenditure £115.18k £78.25k £54.08k £45.44k £12.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A