Financial history THE LONDON EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 299686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.07m £21.93m £24.92m £22.22m £27.12m
Total expenditure £19.45m £21.52m £24.04m £22.22m £26.96m
Income from government contracts N/A £4.82m N/A N/A £433.21k
Income from government grants £4.53m £4.82m £5.36m £5.79m £6.27m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.01k £5.31k £120.08k £470.39k £622.11k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £20.06m £21.92m £24.65m £19.58m £26.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £151.22k £2.16m £239.59k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.45m £21.52m £24.04m £22.22m £26.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £24.02k £57.50k £0 £0 £574.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0