Trustees THE LONDON EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 299686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lauren Georgia Hart Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Ravi Verma Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Kirsty Reed Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
David Inness Rae Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Soumya Sarah Sowani Holliday Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Richard Timmins Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record
Anthony Roy Perkins Trustee 23 July 2019
None on record
Allan Thomas Lambert Trustee 23 July 2019
None on record
MICHAEL THOMAS GARSTKA Trustee 10 November 2014
None on record
LATIF NOORALI SAYANI Trustee 20 May 2014
None on record