Governing document WOODSIDE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED 24TH JUNE 1988, 13TH APRIL 1989, 30TH SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 14 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN KENNELS, CATTERIES, REFUGES, RESCUE HOMES, ANIMAL HOSPITAL, SANCTUARIES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED ANIMALS AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL-TREATED ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.