FRIENDS OF ST PETERS CHURCH

Charity number: 299807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required