FRIENDS OF ST PETERS CHURCH

Charity number: 299807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.46k £12.76k £47.87k £17.13k £1.85k
Total expenditure £16.14k £4.89k £12.76k £17.59k £180
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A