THE BARN OWL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation of the Barn Owl and its Environment through practical conservation work, research, education and free national information and advice service. We also run a Live Owl Emergency Service, a small sanctuary for owls unable to survive in the wild and own and manage 26 acres of land purchased with a legacy in 2001 for Barn Owls and other wildlife. Our website is - www.barnowltrust.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 July 1988: Standard registration
- 18 February 2016: Funds received from 1098639 THE AVIARY SOCIETY
- B O T (Working name)
- BOT ENVIRONMENTAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward McNeil | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|||||
FRANCES JAINE RAMSDEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
SIMON JAMES ROSS WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH RANALD GRANT | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEVIN KEATLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307.16k | £432.90k | £389.06k | £1.32m | £413.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £347.18k | £410.10k | £359.06k | £404.25k | £1.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.14m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.99k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £149.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £962.06k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £384.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.81k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITABLE TRUST DEED DATED 25TH DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 6 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CONSERVATION OF WILDLIFE ESPECIALLY THE BARN OWL AND OTHER ENDAGERED SPECIES AND TO PROVIDE THEM WITH A SAFE BREEDING ENVIRONMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF ENCOURAGING THE RECREATION AND PRESERVATION OF APPROPRIATE ECOLOGICAL CONDITIONS THAT THEY MAY BE PROVIDED WITH THE MEANS TO CONTINUE AND FLOURISH IN AS NATURAL AN ENVIRONMENT AS POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARN OWL TRUST
WATERLEAT
ASHBURTON
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 7HU
- Phone:
- 01364255256
- Email:
- info@barnowltrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window