Trustees THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF FORENSIC SCIENCES

Charity number: 299875
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Alexander Chair 22 April 2013
INSIDE JUSTICE
Received: On time
Dr MENG AW-YONG Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Lorna Hackett Trustee 29 September 2021
SOS SILENCE OF SUICIDE
Received: On time
Leisa Nichols-Drew Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Professor Peter Watson Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Professor Peter Vanezis Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Jill Battley Trustee 19 November 2020
None on record
Stephanie Prior Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record
Dr Johann Grundlingh Trustee 17 October 2019
None on record
Leslie Millin Trustee 17 October 2019
None on record
Steven Gary Harvey Trustee 06 October 2019
None on record
Dr Andrew Forrester Trustee 22 January 2019
None on record
Dr Ann Priston Trustee 01 November 2017
INSIDE JUSTICE
Received: On time
Professor Keith Rix Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR MICHAEL KOPELMAN Trustee 06 December 2012
None on record
Professor DENISE SYNDERCOMBE COURT Trustee
None on record