THE THAMES ROWING CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust's aim is to promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for the sports of rowing and sculling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 09 January 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE ELKINGTON | Chair | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
EMMA CAROLYN AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN QUENTIN DOOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW DAVID SEDDON BA ACA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL MARGARET BRETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.42k | £14.86k | £7.70k | £18.45k | £23.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.78k | £12.77k | £28.10k | £38.55k | £31.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 350 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 AUGUST 1988 AND AMENDED BY VARIATION OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 JANUARY 1998 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 16 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES IN ANY PART OF THE BRITISH ISLES BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS AND WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THAT OBJECT TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE SUCH PUPILS TO ROW AND/OR TO SCULL AND/OR COXING. (II) IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN ANY PART OF THE BRITISH ISLES (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE PROVIDED) FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES (IIA) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE SPORTS OF ROWING AND SCULLING (III) SUCH OBJECTS AND PURPOSE IN THE BRITISH ISLES BEING OBJECTS AND PURPOSES EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 DEALTRY ROAD
LONDON
SW15 6NL
- Phone:
- 07747638632
- Email:
- andrewseddon1@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window