COBALT UNIT APPEAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The only activity during the year was the receipt of legacy income and its transfer to its sole Trustee, the Cobalt Unit Appeal Fund, a charitable company limited by guarantee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 September 1988: Standard registration
- 11 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COBALT (Working name)
- COBALT APPEAL FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.47k | £166.63k | £74.35k | £69.72k | £34.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £299.47k | £166.63k | £74.35k | £69.72k | £34.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 26 September 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 24 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 21 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 16 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 02 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 08 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 23 September 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH JULY 1988 AND SUBJECT TO A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER SECTION 96 (5) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 27 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF CANCER IN PERSONS LIVING IN THE COUNTIES OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE, SOUTH WORCESTERSHIRE BY MEANS OF A COLBAT UNIT AND SUCH OTHER PREVENTION DETECTION AND TREATMENT AS MAY BE FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDED BY THE TRUSTEES INCLUDING THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF EQUIPMENT, AND AMENITIES TO PATIENTS LIVING IN THE SAID AREA OF A KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE HEREFORDSHIRE SOUTH WORCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window