Financial history BLISLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.42k £12.08k £5.57k £20.41k £14.46k
Total expenditure £7.07k £8.18k £7.25k £5.65k £6.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £300 N/A £19.60k £10.67k