Trustees HANNEY WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 300096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Garner | Chair | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Garth John Dennill | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Graham | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Jean Ethelston | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Jane Brettell | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Neil Donovan | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Brettell | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bill Orson | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jim Stagg | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL WINSTON KILBEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.