SHAW-CUM-DONNINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall serves the local community. The regular users of the hall are a Pre School, Girl Guiding, Womens Institute, Parish Council, Horticultural Society and several classes of yoga and dance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,159 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 28 September 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Langford | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GROVES | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Giles | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY CARTER | Trustee | 27 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIA COSH | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.77k | £19.65k | £23.44k | £17.18k | £36.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.21k | £13.30k | £12.00k | £35.03k | £31.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.10k | £11.99k | £850 | £16.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30TH JANUARY 1964 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 3 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
SHAW-CUM-DONNINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOVE LANE
DONNINGTON
NEWBURY
BERKSHIRE
RG14 2JG
- Phone:
- 01635 32586
- Email:
- 4janet.wood@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window