BOURNE END (BUCKINGHAMSHIRE) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 November 2019 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 November 2019 29 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 06 October 2016 On time Download