BOURNE END (BUCKINGHAMSHIRE) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

32 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barrie Penfold Trustee None on record
Elizabeth Ellen Payne Trustee 30 May 2018 None on record
Tony Crossman Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
Peter David Robins Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
Chrissy Hayes Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
Dave Foster Chair 01 June 1977
THE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY Received: On time
Diane Isobel Hall Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
Leigh Robinson Trustee None on record
John Bernard Marsh Trustee 29 May 2015 None on record
CLIVE GWILLIAM Trustee None on record
Bryce Stephen Allen Trustee 15 June 2012 None on record
SUSAN MARY WESTON Trustee 31 May 2018
WOOBURN SCRUBLAND CHARITY Received: On time
KerryLouise Hudson Trustee 02 January 2019 None on record
Geoff Bourne Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
Roger David De Coverly Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
Pat Semon Trustee 24 June 2015 None on record
Keith Iverilll Tomkins Trustee None on record
Jane Lesley Clarke Trustee 14 July 2013 None on record
Mike Appleyard Trustee
MEADOWS PRE-SCHOOL Overdue by 1550 days
BOURNE END JUNIOR SPORTS AND RECREATIONAL CLUB LTD Received: On time
Sue Wagner Trustee 06 September 2013 None on record
PETER WEBB Trustee 20 August 2012 None on record
Laura Elizabeth Manning Trustee 29 May 2015 None on record
Trevor Quantrill Trustee 23 May 2014 None on record
David John Gibson Trustee None on record
Andrew Philip Smith Trustee 15 May 2019 None on record
MRS LIZ HUTTON JP Trustee 29 May 2015
BOURNE END JUNIOR SPORTS AND RECREATIONAL CLUB LTD Received: On time
Michael Peter Judge Trustee 23 May 2014 None on record
DOUGLAS FERGUSSON Trustee 20 August 2012
WYE VALLEY VOLUNTEERS INCORPORATING GOOD NEIGHBOURS Received: On time
Myra Hurley Trustee None on record
BILL HUDSON Trustee 20 August 2012 None on record
Sarah Little Trustee 29 May 2015 None on record
Stuart John Smart Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record