Financial history WEST WYCOMBE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £29.71k £25.78k £22.00k £24.47k £24.12k
Total expenditure £30.60k £19.15k £13.75k £20.89k £29.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k