Financial history Whaddon Jubilee Hall

Charity number: 300348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £13.77k £11.28k £8.96k £5.81k £13.54k
Total expenditure £28.81k £7.23k £5.39k £5.06k £5.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.92k