BARRINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We do not have specific activities for the hall .The groups who hire the hall organise their own activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 02 August 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phyllis Cummings | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Cooper | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Wootton | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ken Stapleton | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROSAMUND RHODES-KEMP | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Burton | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Phillips | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN HOPWOOD | Trustee | 02 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BURTON | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Valerie Tookey | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BOB BRIDGES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.13k | £13.55k | £5.46k | £13.77k | £15.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.76k | £8.60k | £11.12k | £13.09k | £19.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21 JULY 1939 as amended on 10 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
VILLAE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BARRINGTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Mill Lane
Mill Lane
Barrington
Mill Lane
Cambridge
Cambridg
- Phone:
- 01223871863
- Email:
- sheila.potter2@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window