Trustees COVENEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP WENN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Gamlin | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Erika-Jane Burton | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Gilbert | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Nix | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Warner | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Winfield | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHONA MCKENZIE | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane McCartney | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATHY HOMES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.