Financial history DRY DRAYTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.30k £22.95k £11.58k £11.00k £10.51k
Total expenditure £2.63k £5.62k £6.62k £7.60k £9.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £20.91k £3.75k N/A N/A