Financial history BADCOCK RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 300398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £11.16k £13.33k £11.23k £15.51k £8.06k
Total expenditure £12.34k £11.02k £12.10k £10.78k £8.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A