Accounts and annual returns RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 300417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 March 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2022 403 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 March 2022 769 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 March 2022 1134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required