Trustees BIGGLESWADE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 300444
Charity reporting is up to date (151 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Wood | Chair | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne Pullinger | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Sara Bennetts | Trustee | 18 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DOYLE | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Warner | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Keller | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Lawson | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Jenkins-Green | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Louise Preston | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kingerley | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Lattimer | Trustee | 10 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
EDDIE FULLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS LESLIE GURNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN DANSEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN WELLS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.