BIGGLESWADE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 300458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 June 2017 On time Download