BIGGLESWADE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 300458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £62.83k £48.51k £76.86k £67.37k £38.76k
Total expenditure £52.15k £42.20k £91.64k £85.70k £32.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k