Accounts and annual returns 1ST CROWTHORNE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300492
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 March 2025 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 April 2025 67 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 April 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 April 2025 433 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required